SUCCESSION LIST OF HEADMISTRESS
1 | Tmt. K.B. Seetha | 04-07-1949 – 24-04-1980 |
2 | Tmt. Hespy Srinivasan (Assistant in charge) | 25-04-1980 – 15-07-1980 |
3 | Tmt. A. Vasantha | 16-07-1980 – 12-03-1986 |
4 | Tmt. C.D. Premakumari (Assistant in charge) | 13-03-1986 – 08-06-1986 |
5 | Tmt. K.V. Padmavathy | 09-06-1986 – 31-05-2004 |
6 | Selvi. K. Poongothai | 01-06-2004 – 30-06 2007 |
7 | Tmt. R. Narmadha Devi | 01-07-2007 – 31-05-2008 |
8 | Tmt. N. Nalini(i/c) | 02-06-2008 – 31.08-2008 |
9 | Tmt. A. Gunasundari(i/c) | 01-09-2008 – 06.11-2008 |
10 | Tmt. R. Anuradha(i/c) | 07-11-2008 – 31.07-2009 |
11 | Tmt. R. Santha Kumari | 01-08-2009 to till date |