SUCCESSION LIST OF HONORARY SECRETARIES & CORRESPONDENTS
Tmt. R.S. Anusuya Bai | 04-07-1949 – 30-04-1980 |
Tmt. K.B. Seetha | 01-05-1980 – 13-12-1981 |
Selvi L.K. Ganga Bai | 14-12-1981 – 17-08-1983 |
Thiru. Y. Rajagopalan | 18-08-1983 – 31-05-1984 |
Tmt. A. Vasantha (Head Mistress in additional charge) | 01-06-1984 – 21-08-1984 |
Thiru. J. Gopalakrishnan | 22-08-1984 – 31-10-1993 |
Shri. N. Shobha Kant Das | 01-11-1993 – 04-01-1994 |
Shri. K. Gopalan | 05-01-1994 – 10-03-1994 |
Shri. N. Shobha Kant Das- | 11-03-1994 – 21-04-1994 |
Shri. N. Krishnamurthi | 22-04-1994 – 06-08-1998 |
Shri. Pradeep Kumar | 07-08-1998 – 14-03-1999 |
Shri. K.P. Krishna Shetty – | 15-03-1999 – 31-05-2000 |
Shri. D. Cyril | 24-06-2000 – 06-08-2002 |
Shri. E.N. Natarajan | 07-08-2002 – 18-07-2004 |
Shri. R. Ravi Krishna | 19-08-2004 – 30.09.2013 |
Shri Gopalji Agrawal | 30.09.2013 to 31/08/2021 |
Smt Vineeta Agrawal | 31/08/2021 to till date |